|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
(Com. on ED.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5761.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5404.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|