California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2098 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill June 7, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018