|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6496.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5447.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Beall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5445.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|