California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2018

Amended

Bill August 9, 2018
Bill May 2, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018