|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6497.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5447.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|