California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill August 13, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018