California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2132 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/13/2018

                    Amended IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 13, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2132Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2132, as amended, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.

 Amended IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 13, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2132Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2132, as amended, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 13, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 16, 2018

Amended IN  Senate  August 13, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  June 13, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  April 16, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 2132

Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)
February 12, 2018

 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2132, as amended, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. 

The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. 

The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.

This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. 

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.

SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.



17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.

(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that can may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. 

(c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.