Enrolled August 24, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 20, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 13, 2018 Amended IN Senate June 13, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2132Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2132, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. Enrolled August 24, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 20, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 13, 2018 Amended IN Senate June 13, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2132Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2132, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Enrolled August 24, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 20, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 13, 2018 Amended IN Senate June 13, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 16, 2018 Enrolled August 24, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 20, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 13, 2018 Amended IN Senate June 13, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2132 Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall)February 12, 2018 Introduced by Assembly Member Levine(Coauthor: Senator Beall) February 12, 2018 An act to add Section 17951.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2132, Levine. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law.This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. 17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. 17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. 17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code. 17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a person at least 60 years of age with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability. (b) A local entity that chooses to waive or reduce building permit fees pursuant to subdivision (a) shall adopt an ordinance to establish a standard application form that may be used to apply for the waiver or reduction, including the requirements for proof of a qualifying disability. (c) Qualifying disability means a physical or mental disability as defined in subdivisions (j) and (m) of Section 12926 of the Government Code.