|
09/13/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6498.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5444.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5410.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|