|
09/17/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5696.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 7. Page 5648.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|