California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2240 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/27/2018

                            Enrolled  August 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 09, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2240Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonFebruary 13, 2018 An act to amend Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2240, Grayson. Trial Jury Selection and Management Act.Existing law generally requires the jury commissioner to randomly select jurors to participate in voir dire. Existing law prohibits the selection of designated peace officers for voir dire in either criminal or both criminal and civil matters, as specified.This bill would additionally prohibit the selection of designated parole and correctional officers for voir dire in criminal matters.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read:219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.

 Enrolled  August 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 09, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2240Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonFebruary 13, 2018 An act to amend Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2240, Grayson. Trial Jury Selection and Management Act.Existing law generally requires the jury commissioner to randomly select jurors to participate in voir dire. Existing law prohibits the selection of designated peace officers for voir dire in either criminal or both criminal and civil matters, as specified.This bill would additionally prohibit the selection of designated parole and correctional officers for voir dire in criminal matters.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 09, 2018

Enrolled  August 27, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 24, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  May 31, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  April 09, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 2240

Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonFebruary 13, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson
February 13, 2018

 An act to amend Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2240, Grayson. Trial Jury Selection and Management Act.

Existing law generally requires the jury commissioner to randomly select jurors to participate in voir dire. Existing law prohibits the selection of designated peace officers for voir dire in either criminal or both criminal and civil matters, as specified.This bill would additionally prohibit the selection of designated parole and correctional officers for voir dire in criminal matters.

Existing law generally requires the jury commissioner to randomly select jurors to participate in voir dire. Existing law prohibits the selection of designated peace officers for voir dire in either criminal or both criminal and civil matters, as specified.

This bill would additionally prohibit the selection of designated parole and correctional officers for voir dire in criminal matters.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read:219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read:219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.

SECTION 1. Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.

219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.

219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.



219. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the jury commissioner shall randomly select jurors for jury panels to be sent to courtrooms for voir dire.

(b) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in Section 830.1, subdivision (a) of Section 830.2, or subdivision (a) of Section 830.33 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in civil or criminal matters.

(2) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a peace officer, as defined in subdivisions (b) or (c) of Section 830.2 or subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 830.5 of the Penal Code, shall not be selected for voir dire in criminal matters.