|
09/19/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6633.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5591.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 5377.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5253.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|