California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 21, 2018
Bill April 23, 2018
Bill April 10, 2018