LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2308
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2308
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2308
Action History
Assembly
06/12/2018
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
05/02/2018
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/21/2018
Coauthors revised.
Assembly
03/05/2018
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
Assembly
02/14/2018
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
Assembly
02/13/2018
Read first time. To print.