|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5988.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 5645.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|