|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6499.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5438.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 5664.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|