California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill June 25, 2018
Bill May 29, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 25, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018