|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5698.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|