California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2018

Amended

Bill May 1, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018