|
09/28/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6360.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5286.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5117.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|