California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018