|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6623.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5511.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4786.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|