California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill May 29, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018