|
08/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 238, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6243.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|