California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2018

Amended

Bill June 12, 2018
Bill May 1, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018