|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 762, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5853.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|