California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Amended

Bill June 11, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018