|
09/26/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 6635.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5597.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 5556.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|