|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3013.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2460.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1922.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|