California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2017

Amended

Bill August 29, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017