|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 435, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5289.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|