Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5605.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|