California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2017

Amended

Bill June 28, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill May 3, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017