|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 6141.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 5105.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 4935.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|