California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 20, 2018

Amended

Bill June 25, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018