Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 5635.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|