|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3389.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2854.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1890.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|