California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017