California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Amended

Bill June 28, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018