|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6909.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5906.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5429.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|