California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2632 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill May 7, 2018