|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 7005.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5941.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5164.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|