California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018