Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5125.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|