California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2678 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Amended

Bill June 21, 2018
Bill June 7, 2018
Bill May 3, 2018
Bill March 23, 2018