Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |