Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5626.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|