California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2771 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill July 5, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill March 23, 2018