|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5237.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5382.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|