California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2018

Amended

Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018